Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio del Pozzo

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1592BornLa Spezia
11 Jul 162230.4AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
11 Sep 162230.6Ordained BishopBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
1644¹51.9DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio del Pozzo:
Bishop Giulio del Pozzo (born , died 1644) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 77, Number 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015