Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedikt Orsini, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1596Born
21 Jun 162124.8AppointedBishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
22 Aug 162125.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
5 Jan 165457.3DiedBishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania

MicroData Summary for Benedikt Orsini
Bishop Benedikt Orsini O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrahov Dol

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 77
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 72, Number 424
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast