Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Maria (Jacopo) Zambeccari, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Minervino Murge, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1575Born
30 Apr 159823.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Apr 162550.1AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
20 Apr 162550.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
11 Apr 163358.1AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
1635²59.8ResignedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
29 Dec 163560.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Minervino Murge, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Maria (Jacopo) Zambeccari (VIAF: 308197899)
Bishop Gerolamo Maria (Jacopo) Zambeccari O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Minervino Murge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santi Apostoli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 243, and Page 78
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 26
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 15 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Nov 2018

Quantcast