Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ascanio Cardinal Colonna

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1560Born
16 Nov 158626.6Elevated to Cardinal
25 Feb 158726.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
5 Dec 158828.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
14 Jan 159130.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
159534.7AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
8 Nov 159939.5AppointedCardinal-Priest
15 Dec 159939.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
30 Jan 160645.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
5 Jun 160646.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
11 Jun 160646.1Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
17 May 160848.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Colonna (VIAF: 56599983)
Ascanio Cardinal Colonna (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Maria degli Angeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePalace of the Bishops, Palestrina, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family's Chapel, St. John Lateran, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
  • a cardinal for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Nov 1586
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 9
  • c34: AT, 25 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017