Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Faustino Baldini

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1886BornPonsacco
14 Aug 191024.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 193347.3AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
21 Sep 193347.4Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
20 May 196680.1DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

MicroData Summary for Faustino Baldini:
Bishop Faustino Baldini (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Marittima

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013