Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianalberto Cardinal Badoer (Badoaro)

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1649BornVenezia
167727.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 168839.3AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
20 Nov 168839.5Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
17 May 170657.0Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jun 170657.0AppointedPatriarch (Personal Title) of Brescia, Italy
25 Jun 170657.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
11 Jul 171263.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
17 May 171465.0DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Gianalberto Badoer (Badoaro):
Gianalberto Cardinal Badoer (Badoaro) (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 127, and Page 409
  • ob: CB, 11 Dec 2012
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,574
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,238
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015