Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikola Bijanković, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Makarska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1645BornSplit
15 Jun 166923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
7 Nov 168641.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Makarska, Croatia
7 Nov 168641.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
19 Dec 169853.3AppointedBishop of Makarska, Croatia
10 May 169953.7Ordained BishopBishop of Makarska, Croatia
10 Aug 173084.9DiedBishop of Makarska, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Nikola Bijanković:
Bishop Nikola Bijanković C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Makarska

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 251, and Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015