Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amador Merino y Malaguillas

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1677Born
8 Feb 173052.1AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
21 May 173052.3Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
29 Jan 175577.0DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Amador Merino y Malaguillas
Bishop Amador Merino y Malaguillas (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSigüenza

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 302
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 48, Number 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast