Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augusto Guidi

Deceased

President Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1838BornRoma
30 Mar 186123.1Ordained PriestPriest
189253.9AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
189455.9ResignedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
18 May 189456.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
3 Jun 189456.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
16 Mar 190062.1DiedPresident Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia

MicroData Summary for Augusto Guidi:
Archbishop Augusto Guidi (born , died ) President Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013