Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Perea

Deceased

Bishop of Pasto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1853²BornPopayán
19 Dec 190755.0AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
29 Jun 190855.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pasto, Colombia
17 Feb 191158.1DiedBishop of Pasto, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Perea:
Bishop Adolfo Perea (died ) Bishop of Pasto

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013