Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Moisés Aráoz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salta, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Berissa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1823Born
5 Oct 184623.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Oct 184623.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187148.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salta, Argentina
27 Oct 187148.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Berissa
4 Aug 187249.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berissa
12 Aug 188360.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Miguel Moisés Aráoz (VIAF: 193145856860122920239)
Bishop Miguel Moisés Aráoz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTucumán
Ordained BishopBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 147
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 5 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Oct 2018

Quantcast