Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Maria Ossi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Quilon, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1843Born
24 Feb 186622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
3 Apr 188339.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Quilon, India
3 Apr 188339.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
23 Sep 188340.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
14 Dec 188643.2AppointedBishop of Quilon, India
18 Aug 190561.9DiedBishop of Quilon, India

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Maria Ossi
Bishop Ferdinand Maria Ossi O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Quilon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Vito Cadore, Diocese of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
Ordained BishopSte Marie de Nazareth, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 373, and Page 474
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017