Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Antonio Mejía

Deceased

Bishop of Guayana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1877BornMendoza
13 Oct 190124.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 192346.1AppointedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
21 Oct 192346.4Ordained BishopBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
6 Oct 194770.3DiedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Miguel Antonio Mejía:
Bishop Miguel Antonio Mejía (born , died ) Bishop of Guayana

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013