Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis d’Anglure de Bourlemont

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1618BornFrebecourt
Mar 167960.5SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
17 Jul 167960.8ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
1 Oct 167961.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
15 Jul 168061.8AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
10 Sep 168062.0SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
28 Apr 168162.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
9 Nov 169779.1DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for Louis d’Anglure de Bourlemont:
Archbishop Louis d’Anglure de Bourlemont (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 129, and Page 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015