Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego de Castrillo

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623²BornLeón
28 May 167350.4AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
30 Jul 167350.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
16 Nov 167653.9AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
9 Jun 168663.4DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Castrillo:
Archbishop Diego de Castrillo (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 132, and Page 207
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 210, Number 1,313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013