Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonardo Balsarini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chios (Scio)

Titular Archbishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1636¹BornChio
14 May 166832.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
14 May 166832.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
24 Jun 166832.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
Mar 1686³50.1SucceededBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
19 Dec 169862.9ResignedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
19 Dec 169862.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
Dec 1699²63.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Chios (Scio), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Balsarini:
Archbishop Leonardo Balsarini , Bishop Emeritus of Chios (Scio)

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 158, and Page 173
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 267, and Page 313
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015