Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Horatius Ondedei

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1630³BornGubbio
2 Feb 168453.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Feb 168453.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 168454.1AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
16 Apr 168454.1Ordained BishopBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
Mar 1688³58.0DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Horatius Ondedei:
Bishop Horatius Ondedei (born , died Mar 1688) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

  • a priest for 4.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 86
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015