Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Bucci, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1842Born
14 May 186422.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Dec 189957.8AppointedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
27 Dec 189957.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
14 Oct 190058.6DiedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Bucci
Bishop Luciano Bucci O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel Frentano, Archdiocese of Lanciano (e Ortona)
Ordained BishopS. Antonio-via Merulana, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017