Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bouaké

Archidioecesis Buakensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 December 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Côte d’Ivoire
  • Square Kilometers: 18,818 (7,268 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: 01 B.P. 649, Bouake 01, Cote d'Ivoire
  • Telephone: 31.63.24.59
  • Fax: 31.63.24.06

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bouaké
17 May 1951ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Abidjan Prefecture Apostolic of Bouaké (erected)
Diocese of Bouaké
14 September 1955ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bouaké Diocese of Bouaké
13 September 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Abidjan
Diocese of Bouaké
Diocese of Katiola
Diocese of Abengourou (erected)
6 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Bouaké Diocese of Yamoussoukro (erected)
Archdiocese of Bouaké
19 December 1994ElevatedDiocese of Bouaké Archdiocese of Bouaké

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bouaké
195936,317578,9276.3%426301,21063313ap1960
197059,298810,0007.3%1137481,235556916ap1971
1980117,8171,200,0009.8%1344572,066718421ap1981
1990235,3761,306,00018.0%2239613,858568724ap1991
Archdiocese of Bouaké
199768,148684,00010.0%1830481,419516917ap2000
2000125,0001,250,00010.0%1918373,37824626ap2001
2001212,5372,125,31010.0%1627434,94247758ap2002
2002170,8371,750,1209.8%2151722,372737018ap2003
200382,6532,183,6203.8%1925441,878347517ap2004
2004152,240918,73016.6%3119503,044293715ap2005
2006161,000975,00016.5%3916552,927345720ap2007
2012183,0001,071,00017.1%518593,101405923ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013