Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Emile Abbet, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1847BornVens
1868¹20.1ProfessedMember of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
28 Oct 187124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
21 Apr 190961.4SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
24 Jul 190961.7ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
24 Jul 190961.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
19 Sep 190961.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
29 Sep 191163.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
13 Feb 191264.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
3 Aug 191466.7DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Emile Abbet:
Bishop Joseph-Emile Abbet C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015