Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Wüstenberg

Deceased

Apostolic Pro-Nuncio to Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1912Born
3 Mar 193825.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 196654.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
24 Oct 196654.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Japan
21 Dec 196654.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
19 Dec 197361.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire
19 Dec 197361.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Guinea
19 Dec 197361.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Togo
19 Dec 197361.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Dahomey
27 Dec 197563.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Benin
17 Jan 197966.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Netherlands
31 May 198472.2DiedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Bruno Wüstenberg (VIAF: 3246995)
Archbishop Bruno Wüstenberg (born , died ) Apostolic Pro-Nuncio of Netherlands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDuisburg

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 452, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 491, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 541, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,119, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast