Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Laghouat

Dioecesis Laghuatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Gordon MacWilliam, M. Afr., Bishop
  • Claude Jean Narcisse Rault, M. Afr., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Algeria
  • Square Kilometers: 2,107,708 (814,102 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 62, 47008 Ghardaia, Algerie
  • Telephone: (029)88.19.66
  • Fax: 88.17.96

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa
19 July 1901ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Sahara and Sudan Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
10 January 1921Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
28 April 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
10 June 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara Vicariate Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
5 July 1954Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
Diocese of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}
Vicariate Apostolic of Rabat
Prefecture Apostolic of Spanish Sahara and Ifni {Sahara Español e Ifni} (erected)
Diocese of Laghouat
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara Diocese of Laghouat

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
195012,241963,4771.3%4848255312912ap1951
Diocese of Laghouat
19702,8371,053,319.3%2525452601244ap1971
19802,5401,702,540.1%262697339310ap1981
19901402,686,627.0%226285325910ap1991
19988003,583,400.0%171747243510ap2001
20011,5003,726,736.0%161693233910ap2002
20022,0003,782,635.1%11819105273511ap2003
20032,0003,883,035.1%11415133223710ap2004
20042,0003,883,035.1%11516125243710ap2005
20131,2004,324,000.0%3111485163211ap2014
20162,0004,605,712.0%31316125223610ap2017
20192,0804,902,760.0%31114148202610ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast