Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Taiyuan [TaiyŁan]

Archidioecesis Taeiuenensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Meng Ningyou, Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 16,000 (6,180 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Taiyuan, Shanxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}
17 June 1890SplitVicariate Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si) Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}
14 March 1922Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale} (Tatung-fu, Jang-kao, Tienchen, Hunyuan, Kwangling, and Lingkin) Prefecture Apostolic of Tatungfu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of TaiyŁanfu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of TaiyŁanfu
12 May 1926Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of TaiyŁanfu (Fenyang, Siaoyi, Kihsien, Pingyao, Wenhsue, Kiaocheng, Tsinglo, Kolan, Hinghsien, Lanhsien, FangsJian, Linhsien, LisMh, Chungyang, and SMhlo) Vicariate Apostolic of Fenyang [Fenyang] (erected)
12 July 1926Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of TaiyŁanfu (Shohchow, Tsoyun, Hwayen, Fansze, Shanyin, Jinchow, Taichow, Sopingfu, Pinglu, ShencMJi, JSfingwu, Pienkwan, Wuchai, Poku, and Paotehchow) Prefecture Apostolic of Shohchow (erected)
17 June 1931Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of TaiyŁanfu (Yutze, Sliowyang, Pinting, Sienyang, Yuhsien, TaiJcu, Kihsien, Tsinyuan, SuJcow, and Taiyuan) Prefecture Apostolic of YŁtze [Yuci] (erected)
Archdiocese of Taiyuan [TaiyŁan]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of TaiyŁanfu Archdiocese of Taiyuan [TaiyŁan]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Taiyuan [TaiyŁan]
195040,7491,500,0002.7%15264199323124ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of TaiyŁanfu
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 17, Page 23, to Page 25
  • Archdiocese of Taiyuan [TaiyŁan]
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 38, Page 301, to Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024