Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonard Kasanda Lumembu, C.I.C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1936 Born
2 Aug 196428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
3 Apr 199861.9AppointedBishop of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Jul 199862.2Ordained BishopBishop of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Jan 201477.7RetiredBishop of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Léonard Kasanda Lumembu
Bishop Léonard Kasanda Lumembu C.I.C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Luiza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMikalayi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Luiza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,360
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast