Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Werth, S.J.

Bishop of Trasfigurazione a Novosibirsk, Russian Federation

Note/Previous Titular See: (Ordinary for the Faithful of the Byzantine Rite in Russia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1952 Born
14 Aug 197522.8EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
27 May 198431.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
13 Apr 199138.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Siberia, Russian Federation
13 Apr 199138.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bulna
16 Jun 199138.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bulna
18 May 199946.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Western Siberia {Siberia Occidentale}, Russian Federation
11 Feb 200249.3AppointedBishop of Trasfigurazione a Novosibirsk, Russian Federation

MicroData Summary for Joseph Werth
Bishop Joseph Werth S.J. (born ) Bishop of Trasfigurazione a Novosibirsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaraganda, Kazakhstan
Ordained BishopSt. Louis of France, Church, Moscow

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trasfigurazione a Novosibirsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,453
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,914
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 15 Jan 2021

Quantcast