Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Mazur, S.V.D.

Bishop of Ełk, Poland

Apostolic Administrator of Karafuto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1953 Born
8 Sep 197219.0First VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
8 Sep 197825.0Solemn VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
22 Apr 197925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
23 Mar 199844.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siberia, Russian Federation
23 Mar 199844.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabunia
31 May 199844.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabunia
18 May 199945.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Eastern Siberia {Siberia Orientale}, Russian Federation
10 Nov 200047.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Karafuto, Russian Federation
11 Feb 200248.5AppointedBishop of San Giuseppe a Irkutsk, Russian Federation
17 Apr 200349.6AppointedBishop of Ełk, Poland
17 Apr 200349.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Yuzhno Sakhalinsk, Russian Federation
9 Jun 200349.8InstalledBishop of Ełk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Mazur (VIAF: 300541208)
Bishop Jerzy Mazur S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Ełk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHawlowice, Diocese of Przemyśl
Ordained BishopCathedral, Novosibirsk

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ełk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,331
  • svd: CB, 5 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 15 Jan 2021

Quantcast