Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Camilo Vial Risopatrón, P. Schönstatt

Bishop Emeritus of Temuco, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1935 Born
16 Jul 196126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Institute of Schönstatt Fathers
21 Mar 198044.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
21 Mar 198044.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
18 May 198044.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pauzera
20 Dec 198348.5AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Chile
21 Sep 200166.3AppointedBishop of Temuco, Chile
14 May 201377.9RetiredBishop of Temuco, Chile

MicroData Summary for Manuel Camilo Vial Risopatrón
Bishop Manuel Camilo Vial Risopatrón P. Schönstatt (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Temuco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Temuco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 14 May 2013
  • c1: CB, 13 May 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,907
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast