Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Francisco José Cox Huneeus, P. Schönstatt †

Deceased


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1933Born
16 Jul 196127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Institute of Schönstatt Fathers
14 Dec 197440.9AppointedBishop of Chillán, Chile
2 Mar 197541.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chillán, Chile
4 Aug 198147.6AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Family
9 Nov 198147.8ResignedBishop of Chillán, Chile
22 Jan 198551.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of La Serena, Chile
29 Sep 199056.7SucceededArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
16 Apr 199763.3ResignedArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
11 Oct 201884.8Laicized
12 Aug 202086.6Died

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Cox Huneeus (VIAF: 311351055)
(Layman) Francisco José Cox Huneeus P. Schönstatt (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopSan Carlos de Borromeo, Cathedral, Chillán, Diocese of Chillán, Chile
Death PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 57.2 years (Laicized)
  • a bishop for 43.6 years (Laicized)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017
  • laic: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,655
  • d: CB, 12 Aug 2020
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast