Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel José Bernardino Piñera Carvallo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of La Serena, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1915Born
5 Apr 194731.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
11 Feb 195842.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Talca, Chile
11 Feb 195842.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusias ad Hypium
27 Apr 195842.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prusias ad Hypium
10 Dec 196045.2AppointedBishop of Temuco, Chile
7 Jan 196145.2InstalledBishop of Temuco, Chile
28 Dec 197762.2ResignedBishop of Temuco, Chile
1 Jul 198367.7AppointedArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
7 Aug 198367.8InstalledArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
29 Sep 199075.0RetiredArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
21 Jun 2020104.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for Manuel José Bernardino Piñera Carvallo (VIAF: 16127629)
Archbishop Manuel José Bernardino Piñera Carvallo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Serena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopEl Salvador, Church, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceHogar Santo Cura de Ars, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Buried Place (Original)Parque del Recuerdo Américo Vespucio, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 73.2 years
  • a bishop for 62.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • c1/i: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,267
  • d: CB, 21 Jun 2020
  • fn/loc: CB, 22 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast