Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Vieira dos Santos

Bishop of Ourinhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1965 Born
1988²22.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
2000¹34.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Holy Cross
12 Dec 200035.7IncardinatedDeacon of São Paulo, Brazil
15 Dec 200035.7Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
10 Dec 201449.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
10 Dec 201449.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
7 Feb 201549.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia
19 May 202156.1AppointedBishop of Ourinhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Jul 202156.2InstalledBishop of Ourinhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Vieira dos Santos
Bishop Eduardo Vieira dos Santos (born ) Bishop of Ourinhos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBom Sucesso
Ordained BishopSão Paulo, Cathedral, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ourinhos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2014
  • ob: CB, 10 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 1 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,364
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 May 2021
  • inca/deac: CB, 19 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 May 2021

Quantcast