Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Siphiwo Devilliers Paul Vanqa, S.A.C.

Bishop-Elect of Queenstown, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1955 Born
11 Oct 198227.3First VowsMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
6 Oct 198530.3Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
5 Jul 198631.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
2019²63.5AppointedAdministrator of Queenstown, South Africa
3 Mar 202165.7AppointedBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
29 May 202165.9Ordained BishopBishop of Queenstown, South Africa

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Siphiwo Devilliers Paul Vanqa
Father Siphiwo Devilliers Paul Vanqa S.A.C. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Queenstown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXonxa, Diocese of Queenstown

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Queenstown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Mar 2021
  • fn: CB, 3 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 18 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast