Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sergio Lasam Utleg

Archbishop Emeritus of Tuguegarao, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1943 Born
30 Mar 196824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tuguegarao, Philippines
10 Feb 199753.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ilagan, Philippines
17 Mar 199753.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ilagan, Philippines
26 Jul 199955.8SucceededBishop of Ilagan, Philippines
13 Nov 200663.1AppointedBishop of Laoag, Philippines
15 Jun 201167.7AppointedArchbishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
18 Oct 201976.1RetiredArchbishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Sergio Lasam Utleg
Archbishop Sergio Lasam Utleg (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tuguegarao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolana
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Cathedral, Tuguegarao, Archdiocese of Tuguegarao

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tuguegarao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,988
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast