Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Thomas Turley Murphy, O.S.A.

Bishop Emeritus of Chulucanas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1943 Born
21 Dec 196825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
25 May 199653.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chulucanas, Peru
17 Aug 199653.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Chulucanas, Peru
28 Oct 200057.7SucceededBishop of Chulucanas, Peru
2 Apr 202077.1RetiredBishop of Chulucanas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Daniel Thomas Turley Murphy
Bishop Daniel Thomas Turley Murphy O.S.A. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chulucanas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained BishopSagrada Familia, Cathedral, Chulucanas, Diocese of Chulucanas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chulucanas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,781
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast