Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Markijan Trofym’yak

Bishop Emeritus of Lutsk, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1947 Born
8 Dec 197326.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 May 197427.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 199143.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
16 Jan 199143.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
2 Mar 199143.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
25 Mar 199850.9AppointedBishop of Lutsk, Ukraine
16 May 199851.0InstalledBishop of Lutsk, Ukraine
24 Jul 201265.2ResignedBishop of Lutsk, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Markijan Trofym’yak
Bishop Markijan Trofym’yak (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lutsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKozova
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lviv, Archdiocese of Lviv

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lutsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,394
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,758
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 245, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • i/c0: CB, 4 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 May 2021

Quantcast