Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benny Mario Travas

Archbishop of Karachi, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1966 Born
7 Dec 199024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Karachi, Pakistan
13 Jun 201447.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Multan, Pakistan
29 May 201548.5AppointedBishop of Multan, Pakistan
15 Aug 201548.7Ordained BishopBishop of Multan, Pakistan
11 Feb 202154.2AppointedArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Benny Mario Travas
Archbishop Benny Mario Travas (born ) Archbishop of Karachi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarachi, Archdiocese of Karachi
Ordained BishopIn Front Of, Most Holy Redeemer, Cathedral, Multan, Diocese of Multan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Karachi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,560
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Feb 2021

Quantcast