Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rubén Tierrablanca Gonzalez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey

Titular Bishop of Tubernuca

Apostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1952Born
2 Aug 197724.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 197825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Apr 201663.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey
16 Apr 201663.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubernuca
16 Apr 201663.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey
11 Jun 201663.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubernuca
22 Dec 202068.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Rubén Tierrablanca Gonzalez
Bishop Rubén Tierrablanca Gonzalez O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Istanbul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortázar, México
Ordained BishopSaint-Esprit, Cathedral, Istanbul, Vicariate Apostolic of Istanbul
Death PlaceUniversity of Koç, Hospital, Istanbul, Vicariate Apostolic of Istanbul

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 18 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 21 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,937
  • d: CB, 23 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 24 Dec 2020

Quantcast