Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philip Tartaglia

Deceased

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1951Born
30 Jun 197524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Sep 200554.6AppointedBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
20 Nov 200554.8Ordained BishopBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Jul 201261.5AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
8 Sep 201261.6InstalledArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
27 Feb 201362.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Sep 201362.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Jan 202170.0DiedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Philip Tartaglia
Archbishop Philip Tartaglia (born , died ) Archbishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGovan, Glasgow, Lanarkshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestOur Lady of Good Counsel, Church, Dennistoun, Glasgow, Lanarkshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained BishopSaint Mirin, Cathedral, Paisley, Renfrewshire, Diocese of Paisley, Scotland
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, Pollokshields, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Sep 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,008
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2012
  • ab: CB, 27 Feb 2013
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • d: CB, 13 Jan 2021
  • d.loc: CL, 14 Jan 2021
  • 23.loc: CL, 7 Feb 2021
  • c1: CL, 17 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Mar 2021

Quantcast