Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Francis Sullivan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Richmond, Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1928Born
9 May 195324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
15 Oct 197042.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
15 Oct 197042.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Selsea
1 Dec 197042.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selsea
4 Jun 197445.9AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
19 Jul 197446.1InstalledBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
16 Sep 200375.2RetiredBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
11 Dec 201284.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Richmond, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Walter Francis Sullivan
Bishop Walter Francis Sullivan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Richmond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWashington

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast