Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mijo Škvorc, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Hadrumetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1919Born
31 Jul 194828.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Jun 197050.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
16 Jun 197050.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
19 Jul 197050.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
15 Feb 198969.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Mijo Škvorc
Bishop Mijo Škvorc S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRuševac
Ordained BishopZagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 617

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast