Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Shipandeni Shikongo, O.M.I.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Rundu, Namibia

Titular Bishop of Capra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1948 Born
20 Dec 198032.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Mar 199445.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Rundu, Namibia
14 Mar 199445.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Capra
22 May 199445.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capra
16 Nov 202072.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Rundu, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Shipandeni Shikongo
Bishop Joseph Shipandeni Shikongo O.M.I. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Rundu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTyeye
Ordained BishopCathedral, Windhoek, Archdiocese of Windhoek

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Rundu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,345
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast