Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jusztinián György Cardinal Serédi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1884Born
10 Jul 190521.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Jul 190824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Nov 192743.6AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
19 Dec 192743.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 192743.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
8 Jan 192843.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
29 Mar 194560.9DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Jusztinián György Serédi (VIAF: 29603351)
Jusztinián György Cardinal Serédi O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDeáki, Slovakia

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1928, Number 1
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 991, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast