Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop József Grősz

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1887Born
14 Jul 191123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
17 Dec 192841.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
17 Dec 192841.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
24 Feb 192941.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
19 Jul 193951.6AppointedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
7 May 194355.4AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
3 Oct 196173.8DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Grősz
Archbishop József Grősz (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeltorony
Ordained BishopSeminary, Chapel, Győr, Diocese of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast