Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. János Scheffler

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1887Born
6 Jul 191022.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 194254.4AppointedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
17 May 194254.5Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
9 Apr 194860.4AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
6 Dec 195265.1DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
3 Jul 2011Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. János Scheffler
Bishop Bl. János Scheffler (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKálmánd
Ordained BishopSatu Mare {Szatmár}, Diocese of Satu Mare {Szatmár}
Death PlaceAiud

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 22
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,680
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast