Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Vilmos Apor

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1892Born
24 Aug 191523.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 194148.8AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
24 Feb 194148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
2 Apr 194553.0DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
9 Nov 1997Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Vilmos Apor (VIAF: 7240286)
Bishop Bl. Vilmos Apor (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegesvár, Diocese of Alba Iulia, Romania
Ordained BishopChurch, Gyula
Death PlaceGyőr, Diocese of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1941, Number 7
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast