Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carl Schmidt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Thasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1912Born
2 Aug 193624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
8 Jul 196250.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
8 Jul 196250.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasus
9 Sep 196250.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thasus
1 Oct 198169.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
11 Mar 198976.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Carl Schmidt
Bishop Carl Schmidt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObervölklingen

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast