Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eusébio Oscar Cardinal Scheid, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1932Born
3 Jul 196027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
11 Feb 198148.1AppointedBishop of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 May 198148.3Ordained BishopBishop of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Jan 199158.1AppointedArchbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
25 Jul 200168.6AppointedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
3 Oct 200168.8AppointedBishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
21 Oct 200370.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200370.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
27 Feb 200976.2RetiredArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
28 Jul 201077.6RetiredBishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
13 Jan 202188.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eusébio Oscar Scheid
Eusébio Oscar Cardinal Scheid S.C.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuzerna
Ordained BishopSão José dos Campos, Diocese of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo
Death PlaceSão José dos Campos, Diocese of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
  • a cardinal for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2009
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,840, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 13 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Feb 2021

Quantcast