Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Antonio Satué Huerto

Bishop-Elect of Teruel y Albarracín, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1968 Born
4 Sep 199325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Huesca, Spain
16 Jul 202153.4AppointedBishop of Teruel y Albarracín, Spain
2 Oct 202153.6Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel y Albarracín, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Satué Huerto
Father José Antonio Satué Huerto (born ) Bishop-Elect of Teruel y Albarracín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSesa, Diocese of Huesca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Teruel, Diocese of Teruel y Albarracín

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Teruel y Albarracín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2021
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Jul 2021

Quantcast