Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosario Saro Vella, S.D.B.

Bishop of Moramanga, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1952 Born
27 May 197927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
7 Nov 200755.4AppointedBishop of Ambanja, Madagascar
16 Dec 200755.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ambanja, Madagascar
8 Jul 201967.1AppointedBishop of Moramanga, Madagascar
16 Sep 201967.3InstalledBishop of Moramanga, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Rosario Saro Vella
Bishop Rosario Saro Vella S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Moramanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanicatti, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ambanja, Diocese of Ambanja

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Moramanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,581
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2019
  • i: AM, 24 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast