Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Francisco Sarasti Jaramillo, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cali, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1938Born
30 Mar 196324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
8 Mar 197839.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
8 Mar 197839.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Egara
6 May 197839.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egara
23 Dec 198345.3AppointedBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
25 Mar 199354.6AppointedArchbishop of Ibagué, Colombia
17 Aug 200264.0AppointedArchbishop of Cali, Colombia
18 May 201172.8ResignedArchbishop of Cali, Colombia
25 Feb 202182.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cali, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Sarasti Jaramillo
Archbishop Juan Francisco Sarasti Jaramillo C.I.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cali

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCali, Archdiocese of Cali
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Cali, Archdiocese of Cali
Death PlaceCali, Archdiocese of Cali

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,254
  • d: CB, 25 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Mar 2021

Quantcast