Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Epalza Quintero, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Buenaventura, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1940Born
14 Jul 196525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cali, Colombia
30 Jan 198948.6IncardinatedPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
29 Apr 200463.8AppointedBishop of Buenaventura, Colombia
16 Jul 200464.0Ordained BishopBishop of Buenaventura, Colombia
30 Jun 201777.0RetiredBishop of Buenaventura, Colombia
2 Feb 202180.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Buenaventura, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Héctor Epalza Quintero
Bishop Héctor Epalza Quintero P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Buenaventura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConvención
Ordained BishopSan Pedro, Cathedral, Cali, Archdiocese of Cali
Death PlaceClinica Comfamiliar, Pereira, Diocese of Pereira

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,654
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2017
  • d: CB, 2 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Feb 2021

Quantcast